TX SB2190 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Juvenile Justice & Family Issues Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the confinement of juveniles in certain facilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the confinement of juveniles in certain facilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-04 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-05-15HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-08HouseReferred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues
2019-04-08HouseRead first time
2019-04-05HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-04SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-04SenateRecord vote
2019-04-04SenatePassed
2019-04-04SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-04SenateRecord vote
2019-04-04SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-04SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-04SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-04-04SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-04-03SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-03-27SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-03-27SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-03-27SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-03-26SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-03-26SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-26SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-21SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2019-03-21SenateRead first time
2019-03-08SenateFiled
2019-03-08SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback