TX SB2188 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the municipal or county regulation of residential detention facilities for immigrant or refugee children.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the municipal or county regulation of residential detention facilities for immigrant or refugee children.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-27 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1379 (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-18 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-18 Signed by the Governor
2021-06-01 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-30SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-28SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-27HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2021-05-27SenateRecord vote
2021-05-27SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2021-05-27SenateRead
2021-05-27SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2021-05-24SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2021-05-24HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-24HouseRecord vote RV#1379
2021-05-24HousePassed
2021-05-24HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-23HousePassed to 3rd reading
2021-05-23HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-22HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-20HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-18HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-17HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-17HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-14HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-14HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-05-14HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-05-10HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-05-10HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-05-10HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-05-10HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-10HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-28HouseReferred to State Affairs
2021-04-28HouseRead first time
2021-04-21HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-20SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-20SenateRecord vote
2021-04-20SenatePassed
2021-04-20SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-20SenateRecord vote
2021-04-20SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-20SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-20SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-04-20SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-04-19SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-04-14SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-14SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-14SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-04-12SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-12SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-06SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-04-06SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-06SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-06SenatePosting rule suspended
2021-04-06SenateReferred to Local Government
2021-04-06SenateRead first time
2021-04-06SenatePermission to introduce
2021-04-06SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB2188
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB02188I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB02188S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB02188E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB02188H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB02188F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB02188I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB02188I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB02188H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB02188H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB02188F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-20-F.PDF#page=10
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB2188&RcdVtNo=1379&Ch=H&Dt=05/24/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-27-F.PDF#page=117

Bill Comments 750

feedback