TX SB217 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-01 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-01 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the self-directed and semi-independent status of certain agencies and to the requirements applicable to, and the oversight of, those agencies.
Title
Relating to the self-directed and semi-independent status of certain agencies and to the requirements applicable to, and the oversight of, those agencies.
Sponsors
Sen. Juan Hinojosa [D] | Sen. Brian Birdwell [R] | Sen. Donna Campbell [R] | Sen. Jane Nelson [R] |
Sen. Charles Schwertner [R] | Sen. Paul Bettencourt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2015-05-01 | House | Read first time |
2015-04-22 | House | Received from the Senate |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Passed |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Rereferred to committee |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Filed |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
APPRAISER LICENSING & CERTIFICATION BOARD, TEXAS
BANKING, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
CONSUMER CREDIT COMMISSIONER, OFFICE OF
CREDIT UNION DEPARTMENT
LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
SAVINGS & MORTGAGE LENDING, DEPARTMENT OF
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
Sunset
Sunset--Commission Bills
TEXAS REAL ESTATE COMMISSION
BANKING, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
CONSUMER CREDIT COMMISSIONER, OFFICE OF
CREDIT UNION DEPARTMENT
LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
SAVINGS & MORTGAGE LENDING, DEPARTMENT OF
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
Sunset
Sunset--Commission Bills
TEXAS REAL ESTATE COMMISSION