TX SB217 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the continuation and functions of the state employee charitable campaign.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the continuation and functions of the state employee charitable campaign.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-26 - House - SB 217Third Reading House (Y: 109 N: 31 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-14 See remarks for effective date
2013-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2013-05-28 Sent to the Governor
2013-05-27HouseSigned in the House
2013-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2013-05-27SenateReported enrolled
2013-05-27HouseHouse adopts resolution for tech. correction
2013-05-26SenateSenate adopts resolution for tech. correction
2013-05-26HouseSenate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2013-05-26SenateRecord vote
2013-05-26SenateSenate adopts conference committee report
2013-05-26SenateHouse adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2013-05-26HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2013-05-26HouseRecord vote
2013-05-26HouseHouse adopts conference committee report
2013-05-25HouseConf. Comm. Report distributed
2013-05-24SenateConference committee report filed
2013-05-22SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2013-05-22SenateHouse grants request for conf comm-reported
2013-05-22HouseHouse appoints conferees
2013-05-22HouseHouse grants request for conference committee
2013-05-20HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2013-05-20HouseSenate requests conference committee-reported
2013-05-20HouseSenate refuses to concur-reported
2013-05-20SenateSenate appoints conferees
2013-05-20SenateSenate requests conference committee
2013-05-20SenateSenate refuses to concur
2013-05-20SenateRead
2013-05-20SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2013-05-15SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2013-05-15HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2013-05-15HouseRecord vote
2013-05-15HousePassed as amended
2013-05-15HouseAmended
2013-05-15HouseRead 3rd time
2013-05-14HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2013-05-14HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2013-05-14HouseStatement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
2013-05-14HouseAmended
2013-05-14HouseRead 2nd time
2013-05-14HousePlaced on Major State Calendar
2013-05-10HouseConsidered in Calendars
2013-04-24HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2013-04-23HouseCommittee report distributed
2013-04-23HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2013-04-17HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2013-04-17HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-04-15HouseReferred to State Affairs
2013-04-15HouseRead first time
2013-04-11HouseReceived from the Senate
2013-04-11SenateReported engrossed
2013-04-11SenateRecord vote
2013-04-11SenatePassed
2013-04-11SenateRead 3rd time
2013-04-11SenateRecord vote
2013-04-11SenateThree day rule suspended
2013-04-11SenateVote recorded in Journal
2013-04-11SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2013-04-11SenateLaid before the Senate
2013-04-10SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2013-04-11SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2013-04-08SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2013-04-03SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2013-04-03SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2013-04-03SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2013-04-02SenateTestimony taken in committee
2013-04-02SenateConsidered in public hearing
2013-04-02SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-03-12SenateReferred to Government Organization
2013-03-12SenateRead first time
2013-03-07SenateFiled
2013-03-07SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback