TX SB216 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 23 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-03 - Referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the regulation of, and taxes imposed on the sale or use of, cigarettes, tobacco products, and e-cigarettes; imposing taxes; requiring a permit; imposing a fee; providing administrative penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the regulation of, and taxes imposed on the sale or use of, cigarettes, tobacco products, and e-cigarettes; imposing taxes; requiring a permit; imposing a fee; providing administrative penalties.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-03SenateReferred to Finance
2021-03-03SenateRead first time
2020-11-23SenateFiled
2020-11-23SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB1255 (Same As) 2021-03-04 - Referred to Ways & Means
HB1523 (Same As) 2021-03-08 - Referred to Ways & Means

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback