TX SB2156 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-26 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-26 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of the Brazoria County Water Control and Improvement District No. 10; granting a limited power of eminent domain; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose assessments, fees, and taxes.
Title
Relating to the creation of the Brazoria County Water Control and Improvement District No. 10; granting a limited power of eminent domain; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose assessments, fees, and taxes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Recommendations filed with the Senate |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Transmitted to the Governor |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB4606 (Same As) 2021-06-15 - Effective immediately
HB4606 (Same As) 2021-06-15 - Effective immediately
HB4606 (Same As) 2021-06-15 - Effective immediately
Subjects
BRAZORIA COUNTY WATER CONTROL & IMPROVEMENT DISTRICT NO. 10
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Special Districts & Authorities--Water Control Improve Dist.
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Special Districts & Authorities--Water Control Improve Dist.