TX SB2154 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4)
Status: Passed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4)
Status: Passed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the membership of the Public Utility Commission of Texas.
Title
Relating to the membership of the Public Utility Commission of Texas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-30 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-30 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-30 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1757 (Y: 109 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-05-23 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1304 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - RV#1292 (Y: 75 N: 68 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - RV#1291 (Y: 128 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1290 (Y: 69 N: 71 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-30 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-30 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1757 (Y: 109 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-05-23 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1304 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - RV#1292 (Y: 75 N: 68 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - RV#1291 (Y: 128 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1290 (Y: 69 N: 71 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-18 | Effective immediately | |
2021-06-18 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-31 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-30 | House | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Senate adopts conference committee report |
2021-05-30 | Senate | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2021-05-30 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-30 | House | Record vote RV#1757 |
2021-05-30 | House | House adopts conference committee report |
2021-05-29 | House | Conf. Comm. Report distributed |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Conference committee report filed |
2021-05-27 | Senate | House appoints conferees w/inst-reported |
2021-05-27 | Senate | House grants request for conf comm-reported |
2021-05-27 | House | House appoints conferees with instructions |
2021-05-27 | House | Motion prevails |
2021-05-27 | House | Motion to instruct conferees |
2021-05-27 | House | House grants request for conference committee |
2021-05-25 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2021-05-25 | House | Senate requests conference committee-reported |
2021-05-25 | House | Senate refuses to concur-reported |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Senate requests conference committee |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Read |
2021-05-25 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2021-05-24 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2021-05-23 | House | Record vote RV#1304 |
2021-05-23 | House | Passed |
2021-05-23 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-20 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2021-05-20 | House | Amended 4-Martinez Fischer |
2021-05-20 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-20 | House | Record vote RV#1292 |
2021-05-20 | House | Amended 3-Martinez Fischer |
2021-05-20 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-20 | House | Record vote RV#1291 |
2021-05-20 | House | Amended 2-Darby, Ashby, Rogers, K. King, Kacal, Talarico, Raney, Craddick, Geren, Smith, Lambert, More |
2021-05-20 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-20 | House | Record vote RV#1290 |
2021-05-20 | House | Amendment fails of adoption 1-Anchia |
2021-05-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-20 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-17 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-05-14 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-13 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-13 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-05-10 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-05-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-07 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-05-07 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-05-07 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-07 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-06 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2021-05-06 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-04-07 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2021-04-07 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-29 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Passed |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Amended |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Schwertner |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Jurisprudence |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |