TX SB215 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-20 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Public Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-20 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Public Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of the office of inspector general at the Texas Education Agency to investigate the administration of public education.
Title
Relating to the creation of the office of inspector general at the Texas Education Agency to investigate the administration of public education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-29 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-05-20 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-05-04 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2021-05-04 | House | Read first time |
2021-04-29 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Passed |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2020-11-23 | Senate | Filed |
2020-11-23 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
INSPECTOR GENERAL AT THE TEXAS EDUCATION AGENCY, OFFICE OF
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Newly Proposed
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
INSPECTOR GENERAL AT THE TEXAS EDUCATION AGENCY, OFFICE OF
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Newly Proposed