TX SB2135 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Summary
Relating to a monument dedicated to members of the armed forces from this state who died in combat.
Title
Relating to a monument dedicated to members of the armed forces from this state who died in combat.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective immediately | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-31 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-30 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-28 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-28 | House passage reported | |
2009-05-27 | Record vote | |
2009-05-27 | Passed | |
2009-05-27 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-27 | Passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-27 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-27 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-26 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-05-26 | Rules suspended | |
2009-05-26 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-05-26 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-26 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-20 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-05-20 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-05-20 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-05-20 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-20 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-04 | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs | |
2009-05-04 | Read first time | |
2009-04-30 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-04-30 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-30 | Record vote | |
2009-04-30 | Passed | |
2009-04-30 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-30 | Record vote | |
2009-04-30 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-30 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-30 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-30 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-04-30 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-22 | Co-author authorized | |
2009-04-17 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-17 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-17 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-04-16 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-16 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-15 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-15 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-04-15 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-15 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-31 | Referred to Veteran Affairs & Military Instal | |
2009-03-31 | Read first time | |
2009-03-13 | Filed | |
2009-03-13 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Cemeteries
Military & Veterans
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
STATE CEMETERY
STATE CEMETERY COMMITTEE
VETERANS COMMISSION, TEXAS
Military & Veterans
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
STATE CEMETERY
STATE CEMETERY COMMITTEE
VETERANS COMMISSION, TEXAS