TX SB2127 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
Pending: House Homeland Security & Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a border operations training program for peace officers employed by local law enforcement agencies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a border operations training program for peace officers employed by local law enforcement agencies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-02HouseReferred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
2019-05-02HouseRead first time
2019-04-25HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-24SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-24SenateRecord vote
2019-04-24SenatePassed
2019-04-24SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-24SenateRecord vote
2019-04-24SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-04-24SenateCo-author authorized
2019-04-23SenateRecord vote
2019-04-23SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-04-23SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-23SenateAmended
2019-04-23SenateAmendment(s) offered FA5 Creighton
2019-04-23SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-23SenateAmended
2019-04-23SenateAmendment(s) offered FA4 Creighton
2019-04-23SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-23SenateAmended
2019-04-23SenateAmendment(s) offered FA3 Creighton
2019-04-23SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-23SenateAmended
2019-04-23SenateAmendment(s) offered FA2 Creighton
2019-04-23SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-23SenateAmended
2019-04-23SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Creighton
2019-04-23SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-23SenateRecord vote
2019-04-23SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-04-15SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-11SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-11SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-08SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-03SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-04-03SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-03SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-03SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-21SenateReferred to Vet Affairs & Border Security
2019-03-21SenateRead first time
2019-03-07SenateFiled
2019-03-07SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback