TX SB2122 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-13 - Referred to Public Health
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-13 - Referred to Public Health
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to itemized billing for health care services and supplies provided by health care providers.
Title
Relating to itemized billing for health care services and supplies provided by health care providers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2021-05-13 | House | Read first time |
2021-05-11 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Passed |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |