TX SB2117 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to approval of school district and charter school partnerships to operate school district campuses and programs and to eligibility for state funding.
Title
Relating to approval of school district and charter school partnerships to operate school district campuses and programs and to eligibility for state funding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-25 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - Amended RV#1677 (Y: 103 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - Amended RV#1677 (Y: 103 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Effective immediately | |
2019-06-10 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-26 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-26 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-25 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Read |
2019-05-25 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2019-05-22 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2019-05-22 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-22 | House | Record vote RV#1677 |
2019-05-22 | House | Passed as amended |
2019-05-22 | House | Amended 1-Bohac |
2019-05-22 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-21 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-21 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2019-05-21 | House | Amended 2-Sanford |
2019-05-21 | House | Amended 1-Bohac |
2019-05-21 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-21 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-19 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-05-17 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-05-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-17 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-16 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-16 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-05-16 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2019-05-16 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-05-14 | House | Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm. |
2019-05-14 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-05-14 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-05-06 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2019-05-06 | House | Read first time |
2019-05-02 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Amended |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Flores |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3861 (Same As) 2019-04-30 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Accountability
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Accountability
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--General