TX SB211 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to judicial review of acts by the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to judicial review of acts by the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-11 - House - Read 3rd time RV#951 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-30 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-05-30 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-19 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-19HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-19SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-18SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-18SenateHouse passage reported
2021-05-11HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-11HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-11HouseRecord vote RV#951
2021-05-11HousePassed
2021-05-11HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-11HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-11HousePassed to 3rd reading
2021-05-11HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-11HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2021-05-07HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2021-05-04HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-05-03HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-03HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-29HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-29HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-04-29HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-26HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-26HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-26HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-26HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-15HouseReferred to Environmental Regulation
2021-04-15HouseRead first time
2021-04-12HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-09SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-09SenateRecord vote
2021-04-09SenatePassed
2021-04-09SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-09SenateRecord vote
2021-04-09SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-09SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-09SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-04-09SenateLaid before the Senate
2021-04-09SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-03-30SenateCorrected comm. report printed & distributed
2021-03-26SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-03-26SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-03-26SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-03-25SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-18SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-03-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-03SenateReferred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
2021-03-03SenateRead first time
2020-11-18SenateFiled
2020-11-18SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB211
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00211I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00211S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00211E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00211H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00211F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00211I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00211I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00211E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00211H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00211F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-09-F.PDF#page=2
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB211&RcdVtNo=951&Ch=H&Dt=05/11/2021

Bill Comments

feedback