TX SB2105 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-13 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-13 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the appointment of an educational representative for certain students with disabilities.
Title
Relating to the appointment of an educational representative for certain students with disabilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB877 (Same As) 2021-03-01 - Referred to Public Education
Subjects
Disabilities, Persons with
Education
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
INFORMED CONSENT
Education
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
INFORMED CONSENT