TX SB21 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the distribution, possession, purchase, consumption, and receipt of cigarettes, e-cigarettes, and tobacco products.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the distribution, possession, purchase, consumption, and receipt of cigarettes, e-cigarettes, and tobacco products.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-03-18SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-03-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-12SenateCo-author authorized
2019-03-06SenateCo-author authorized
2019-03-05SenateCo-author authorized
2019-03-01SenateReferred to State Affairs
2019-03-01SenateRead first time
2019-02-27SenateCo-author authorized
2019-02-25SenateFiled
2019-02-25SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB749 (Same As) 2019-03-06 - Left pending in committee

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback