TX SB21 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-5)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-15 - Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the distribution, possession, purchase, consumption, and receipt of cigarettes, e-cigarettes, and tobacco products.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the distribution, possession, purchase, consumption, and receipt of cigarettes, e-cigarettes, and tobacco products.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-09 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-15HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-15HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-11HouseReferred to Public Health
2019-04-11HouseRead first time
2019-04-10HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-09SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-09SenateRecord vote
2019-04-09SenatePassed
2019-04-09SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-09SenateRecord vote
2019-04-09SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-04-09SenateRecord vote
2019-04-09SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-04-09SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-09SenateAmended
2019-04-09SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Huffman
2019-04-09SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-09SenateRecord vote
2019-04-09SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-04-09SenateCo-author authorized
2019-04-04SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-03SenateCo-author authorized
2019-04-02SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-02SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-01SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-18SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-03-18SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-03-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-12SenateCo-author authorized
2019-03-06SenateCo-author authorized
2019-03-05SenateCo-author authorized
2019-03-01SenateReferred to State Affairs
2019-03-01SenateRead first time
2019-02-27SenateCo-author authorized
2019-02-25SenateFiled
2019-02-25SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB749 (Same As) 2019-04-08 - Considered in Calendars

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback