TX SB21 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-16)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Record vote
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the distribution, possession, purchase, consumption, and receipt of cigarettes, e-cigarettes, and tobacco products.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the distribution, possession, purchase, consumption, and receipt of cigarettes, e-cigarettes, and tobacco products.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-15 - House - Point of order withdrawn RV#1392 (Y: 110 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - Amendment tabled RV#1378 (Y: 102 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - Amendment tabled RV#1377 (Y: 93 N: 44 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21SenateRecord vote
2019-05-21SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2019-05-21SenateRead
2019-05-21SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2019-05-15SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2019-05-15HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-15HouseRecord vote RV#1392
2019-05-15HousePassed as amended
2019-05-15HousePoint of order withdrawn Article III, Section 35(b)
2019-05-15HousePoint of order overruled Rule 8, Section 3
2019-05-15HousePoint of order withdrawn Rule 11, Section 2,
2019-05-15HouseAmended 3-Schaefer
2019-05-15HouseAmended 2-Dutton
2019-05-15HouseAmendment withdrawn 1-Dutton
2019-05-15HousePoint of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2
2019-05-15HouseAmendment(s) offered 1-Dutton
2019-05-15HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-14HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2019-05-14HouseAmended 7-Cain
2019-05-14HousePoint of order overruled Rule 4, Section 32(c)(2)
2019-05-14HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-14HouseRecord vote RV#1378
2019-05-14HouseAmendment tabled 6-Tinderholt
2019-05-14HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-14HouseRecord vote RV#1377
2019-05-14HouseAmendment tabled 5-Holland and Canales
2019-05-14HouseAmended 4-Dutton
2019-05-14HouseAmended 3-Schaefer
2019-05-14HouseAmended 2-Zerwas
2019-05-14HouseAmended 1-Zerwas
2019-05-14HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-14HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-10HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-25HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-24HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-24HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-15HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-15HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-11HouseReferred to Public Health
2019-04-11HouseRead first time
2019-04-10HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-09SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-09SenateRecord vote
2019-04-09SenatePassed
2019-04-09SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-09SenateRecord vote
2019-04-09SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-04-09SenateRecord vote
2019-04-09SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-04-09SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-09SenateAmended
2019-04-09SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Huffman
2019-04-09SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-09SenateRecord vote
2019-04-09SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-04-09SenateCo-author authorized
2019-04-04SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-03SenateCo-author authorized
2019-04-02SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-02SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-01SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-18SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-03-18SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-03-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-12SenateCo-author authorized
2019-03-06SenateCo-author authorized
2019-03-05SenateCo-author authorized
2019-03-01SenateReferred to State Affairs
2019-03-01SenateRead first time
2019-02-27SenateCo-author authorized
2019-02-25SenateFiled
2019-02-25SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB749 (Same As) 2019-04-08 - Considered in Calendars

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB21
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00021I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00021S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00021E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB00021H.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ04-09-F1.PDF#page=16
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ04-09-F1.PDF#page=17
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ04-09-F.PDF#page=5
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB21&RcdVtNo=1377&Ch=H&Dt=05/14/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB21&RcdVtNo=1378&Ch=H&Dt=05/14/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB21&RcdVtNo=1392&Ch=H&Dt=05/15/2019

Bill Comments

feedback