TX SB21 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-16)
Status: Passed on June 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-16)
Status: Passed on June 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the distribution, possession, purchase, consumption, and receipt of cigarettes, e-cigarettes, and tobacco products.
Title
Relating to the distribution, possession, purchase, consumption, and receipt of cigarettes, e-cigarettes, and tobacco products.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - Point of order withdrawn RV#1392 (Y: 110 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - Amendment tabled RV#1378 (Y: 102 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - Amendment tabled RV#1377 (Y: 93 N: 44 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - Point of order withdrawn RV#1392 (Y: 110 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - Amendment tabled RV#1378 (Y: 102 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - Amendment tabled RV#1377 (Y: 93 N: 44 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-07 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-06-07 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-25 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-21 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read |
2019-05-21 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2019-05-15 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2019-05-15 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-15 | House | Record vote RV#1392 |
2019-05-15 | House | Passed as amended |
2019-05-15 | House | Point of order withdrawn Article III, Section 35(b) |
2019-05-15 | House | Point of order overruled Rule 8, Section 3 |
2019-05-15 | House | Point of order withdrawn Rule 11, Section 2 |
2019-05-15 | House | Amended 3-Schaefer |
2019-05-15 | House | Amended 2-Dutton |
2019-05-15 | House | Amendment withdrawn 1-Dutton |
2019-05-15 | House | Point of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2 |
2019-05-15 | House | Amendment(s) offered 1-Dutton |
2019-05-15 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-14 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2019-05-14 | House | Amended 7-Cain |
2019-05-14 | House | Point of order overruled Rule 4, Section 32(c)(2) |
2019-05-14 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-14 | House | Record vote RV#1378 |
2019-05-14 | House | Amendment tabled 6-Tinderholt |
2019-05-14 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-14 | House | Record vote RV#1377 |
2019-05-14 | House | Amendment tabled 5-Holland and Canales |
2019-05-14 | House | Amended 4-Dutton |
2019-05-14 | House | Amended 3-Schaefer |
2019-05-14 | House | Amended 2-Zerwas |
2019-05-14 | House | Amended 1-Zerwas |
2019-05-14 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-14 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-05-10 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-25 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-24 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-15 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-15 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2019-04-11 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-10 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Amended |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Huffman |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB749 (Same As) 2019-04-08 - Considered in Calendars
Subjects
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Health
Health Care Providers
Health--General
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
Tobacco Products
Health
Health Care Providers
Health--General
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
Tobacco Products