TX SB2094 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-25 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the assessment of public school students, the establishment of a strong foundations grant program, and providing accelerated instruction for students who fail to achieve satisfactory performance on certain assessment instruments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the assessment of public school students, the establishment of a strong foundations grant program, and providing accelerated instruction for students who fail to achieve satisfactory performance on certain assessment instruments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-25HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-23HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-23HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-22HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-22HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-20HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-20HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-05-20HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-05-18HouseReferred to Public Education
2021-05-18HouseRead first time
2021-05-18HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-05-17SenateReported engrossed
2021-05-17SenateRecord vote
2021-05-17SenatePassed
2021-05-17SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-17SenateRecord vote
2021-05-17SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-17SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-17SenatePassed to engrossment
2021-05-17SenateAmendment withdrawn
2021-05-17SenateAmendment(s) offered
2021-05-17SenateRead 2nd time
2021-05-17SenateRecord vote
2021-05-17SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-17SenateCo-author authorized
2021-05-14SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-13SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-13SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-10SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-06SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-05-06SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-05-06SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-06SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-01SenateReferred to Education
2021-04-01SenateRead first time
2021-03-12SenateFiled
2021-03-12SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB4545 (Similar To) 2021-06-16 - Effective immediately
HB4545 (Similar To) 2021-06-16 - Effective immediately

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB2094
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB02094I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB02094S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB02094E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB02094H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB02094I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB02094I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB02094S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB02094S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB02094H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB02094H.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-17-F.PDF#page=63
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-17-F.PDF#page=64

Bill Comments 750

feedback