TX SB2092 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-19 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-19 - Co-author authorized
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a cost-of-living adjustment applicable to certain benefits paid by the Teacher Retirement System of Texas.
Title
Relating to a cost-of-living adjustment applicable to certain benefits paid by the Teacher Retirement System of Texas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-19 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3206 (Similar To) 2021-03-19 - Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services
HB3214 (Similar To) 2021-04-22 - Committee report sent to Calendars
HB3214 (Similar To) 2021-04-22 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB2092 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB02092I.htm |