TX SB2089 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 33-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-19 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a health care facility's policies regarding advance directives or health care or treatment decisions made by or on behalf of patients.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a health care facility's policies regarding advance directives or health care or treatment decisions made by or on behalf of patients.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-14 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Vote recorded in Journal (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - FA1 Hughes (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-19HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-19HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-18HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-17HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-05-17HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-05-16HouseReferred to State Affairs
2019-05-16HouseRead first time
2019-05-15HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-05-14SenateReported engrossed
2019-05-14SenateRecord vote
2019-05-14SenatePassed
2019-05-14SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-14SenateRecord vote
2019-05-14SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-14SenateRecord vote
2019-05-14SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-05-14SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-14SenateAmended
2019-05-14SenateAmendment(s) offered FA2 Lucio
2019-05-14SenateRecord vote
2019-05-14SenateAmended
2019-05-14SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Hughes
2019-05-14SenateRead 2nd time
2019-05-14SenateRecord vote
2019-05-14SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-14SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-14SenateCo-author authorized
2019-05-13SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2019-05-02SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-01SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-01SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-04-30SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-10SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-04-10SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-10SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-10SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-25SenateCo-author authorized
2019-03-21SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2019-03-21SenateRead first time
2019-03-19SenateCo-author authorized
2019-03-07SenateFiled
2019-03-07SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB3158 (Same As) 2019-03-13 - Referred to Public Health

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback