TX SB2086 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Referred to Human Services
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a single Internet portal or equivalent electronic system through which Medicaid providers may submit and receive information.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a single Internet portal or equivalent electronic system through which Medicaid providers may submit and receive information.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-14 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16HouseReferred to Human Services
2019-05-16HouseRead first time
2019-05-14HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-05-14SenateReported engrossed
2019-05-14SenateRecord vote
2019-05-14SenatePassed
2019-05-14SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-14SenateRecord vote
2019-05-14SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-14SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-14SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-05-14SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-14SenateAmended
2019-05-14SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Hinojosa
2019-05-14SenateRead 2nd time
2019-05-14SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-13SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-09SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-09SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-09SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-07SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-16SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-04-16SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-16SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-16SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-21SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2019-03-21SenateRead first time
2019-03-07SenateFiled
2019-03-07SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB2221 (Similar To) 2019-03-26 - Left pending in committee

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback