TX SB2082 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the work-study student mentorship program administered by the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the work-study student mentorship program administered by the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-17 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1308 (Y: 131 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-26 Effective immediately
2017-05-26 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-19 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-19HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-19SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-18SenateReported enrolled
2017-05-18SenateHouse passage reported
2017-05-17HouseRecord vote
2017-05-17HousePassed
2017-05-17HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-16HousePassed to 3rd reading
2017-05-16HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-16HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-11HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-05-11HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-11HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-10HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-05-09HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-05-09HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-05-08HouseReferred to Higher Education
2017-05-08HouseRead first time
2017-05-04HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-05-04SenateReported engrossed
2017-05-04SenateRecord vote
2017-05-04SenatePassed
2017-05-04SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-04SenateRecord vote
2017-05-04SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-04SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-04SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2017-05-04SenateLaid before the Senate
2017-05-04SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-20SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-04-20SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2017-04-20SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-04-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-19SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-28SenateReferred to Higher Education
2017-03-28SenateRead first time
2017-03-10SenateFiled
2017-03-10SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback