TX SB2081 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to class size limits for prekindergarten classes provided by or on behalf of public schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to class size limits for prekindergarten classes provided by or on behalf of public schools.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-26 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1520 (Y: 87 N: 61 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - FA1 Bettencourt (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-18 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-18 Signed by the Governor
2021-06-01 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-30SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-28SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-27SenateHouse passage reported
2021-05-26HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-26HouseRecord vote RV#1520
2021-05-26HousePassed
2021-05-26HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-25HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-25HousePassed to 3rd reading
2021-05-25HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-25HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-23HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-23HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-22HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-22HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-19HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-05-19HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-05-13HouseReferred to Public Education
2021-05-13HouseRead first time
2021-05-12HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-05-12SenateReported engrossed
2021-05-12SenateRecord vote
2021-05-12SenatePassed
2021-05-12SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-12SenateRecord vote
2021-05-12SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-12SenateRecord vote
2021-05-12SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-05-12SenateRecord vote
2021-05-12SenateAmended
2021-05-12SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Bettencourt
2021-05-12SenateRead 2nd time
2021-05-12SenateRecord vote
2021-05-12SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-12SenateCo-author authorized
2021-05-11SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-10SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2021-05-04SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-04SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-30SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-30SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-28SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-27SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-04-27SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-04-27SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-27SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-26SenatePosting rule suspended
2021-04-01SenateReferred to Education
2021-04-01SenateRead first time
2021-03-12SenateFiled
2021-03-12SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB41 (Similar To) 2021-05-17 - Received from the House
HB41 (Similar To) 2021-05-17 - Received from the House

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB2081
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB02081I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB02081S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB02081E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB02081H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB02081F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB02081S2F1.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB02081I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB02081I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB02081S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB02081S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB02081E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB02081H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB02081F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-12-F.PDF#page=25
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-12-F.PDF#page=26
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB2081&RcdVtNo=1520&Ch=H&Dt=05/26/2021

Bill Comments 750

feedback