TX SB208 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-27 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-27 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the regulation of metal recycling entities; providing an administrative penalty; creating a criminal offense.
Title
Relating to the regulation of metal recycling entities; providing an administrative penalty; creating a criminal offense.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-19 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1358 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-27 | Effective on 9/1/17 | |
2017-05-27 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-23 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-23 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-21 | Senate | House passage reported |
2017-05-19 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-19 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-19 | House | Passed |
2017-05-19 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-19 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-19 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-19 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-19 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-05-16 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-05-08 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-05-07 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-06 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-04 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-04 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-05-04 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-02 | House | Referred to Environmental Regulation |
2017-05-02 | House | Read first time |
2017-04-19 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Passed |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Amended |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Read first time |
2016-11-14 | Senate | Filed |
2016-11-14 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Environment
Environment--Recycling
EXPLOSIVES
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
PUBLIC SAFETY COMMISSION
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Safety
SECONDHAND METAL
Environment--Recycling
EXPLOSIVES
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
PUBLIC SAFETY COMMISSION
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Safety
SECONDHAND METAL