TX SB2079 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-12 - Referred to Higher Education
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a requirement that a student's postsecondary transcript include the average or median grade awarded in each class.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a requirement that a student's postsecondary transcript include the average or median grade awarded in each class.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-10 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-12HouseReferred to Higher Education
2017-05-12HouseRead first time
2017-05-10HouseReceived from the Senate
2017-05-10SenateReported engrossed
2017-05-10SenateRecord vote
2017-05-10SenatePassed
2017-05-10SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-10SenateRecord vote
2017-05-10SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-10SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-10SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2017-05-10SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-10SenateAmended
2017-05-10SenateAmendment(s) offered
2017-05-10SenateRead 2nd time
2017-05-10SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-10SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-09SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-08SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-08SenateReported favorably as substituted
2017-05-03SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-26SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-04-26SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-04-26SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-26SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-28SenateReferred to Higher Education
2017-03-28SenateRead first time
2017-03-10SenateFiled
2017-03-10SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback