TX SB2053 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-04 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-04 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the disposition of burial spaces and abandoned plots in certain cemeteries in the possession and control of a municipality.
Title
Relating to the disposition of burial spaces and abandoned plots in certain cemeteries in the possession and control of a municipality.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-04 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Filed |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |