TX SB2051 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-16 - Co-author authorized
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-16 - Co-author authorized
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to evaluating public school performance.
Title
Relating to evaluating public school performance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-16 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Filed |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
ACADEMIC PERFORMANCE
Education
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Accountability
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Education--Primary & Secondary--Extracurricular Activities
Education--Primary & Secondary--Testing
Education
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Accountability
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Education--Primary & Secondary--Extracurricular Activities
Education--Primary & Secondary--Testing