TX SB2050 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the creation of the aviation development account.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the creation of the aviation development account.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-17SenateCo-author authorized
2019-04-15SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-15SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-15SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-04-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-11SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-04-11SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-11SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-11SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-21SenateReferred to Finance
2019-03-21SenateRead first time
2019-03-07SenateFiled
2019-03-07SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback