TX SB204 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the operation of a public school transportation system.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the operation of a public school transportation system.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-30 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-30 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1744 (Y: 138 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1477 (Y: 115 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-14 Effective immediately
2021-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2021-06-01 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-31SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-31HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-31SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-30SenateHouse adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2021-05-30HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-30HouseRecord vote RV#1744
2021-05-30HouseHouse adopts conference committee report
2021-05-30HouseSenate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2021-05-30SenateRecord vote
2021-05-30SenateSenate adopts conference committee report
2021-05-29HouseConf. Comm. Report distributed
2021-05-29SenateConference committee report filed
2021-05-28SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2021-05-28SenateHouse grants request for conf comm-reported
2021-05-28HouseHouse appoints conferees
2021-05-28HouseHouse grants request for conference committee
2021-05-27HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2021-05-27HouseSenate requests conference committee-reported
2021-05-27HouseSenate refuses to concur-reported
2021-05-27SenateSenate appoints conferees
2021-05-27SenateSenate requests conference committee
2021-05-27SenateSenate refuses to concur
2021-05-27SenateRead
2021-05-27SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2021-05-25SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2021-05-25HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-25HouseRecord vote RV#1477
2021-05-25HousePassed
2021-05-25HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-24HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2021-05-24HouseAmended 1-Huberty
2021-05-24HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-24HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-20HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-14HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-13HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-13HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-03HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-05-03HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-14HouseReferred to Public Education
2021-04-14HouseRead first time
2021-04-13HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-12SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-12SenateRecord vote
2021-04-12SenatePassed
2021-04-12SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-12SenateRecord vote
2021-04-12SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-12SenateRecord vote
2021-04-12SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-04-12SenateRecord vote
2021-04-12SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-03-30SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-03-29SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-03-29SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-03-25SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-23SenateCo-author authorized
2021-03-18SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-03-18SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-03-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-03SenateReferred to Education
2021-03-03SenateRead first time
2020-11-17SenateFiled
2020-11-17SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB3129 (Same As) 2021-05-10 - Considered in Calendars

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB204
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00204I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00204S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00204E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00204H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00204F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/SB00204H21.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00204I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00204I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00204H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00204F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00204F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-12-F.PDF#page=15
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-12-F.PDF#page=16
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB204&RcdVtNo=1477&Ch=H&Dt=05/25/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB204&RcdVtNo=1744&Ch=H&Dt=05/30/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-30-F.PDF#page=19

Bill Comments 750

feedback