TX SB204 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-23 - Placed on General State Calendar
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-23 - Placed on General State Calendar
Summary
Relating to a prohibition of foods containing trans fat.
Title
Relating to a prohibition of foods containing trans fat.
Sponsors
Sen. Carol Alvarado [D] | Rep. Garnet Coleman [D] | Rep. Veronica Gonzales [D] | Rep. Eddie Lucio [D] |
Sen. Eliot Shapleigh [D] | Rep. John Zerwas [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-23 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-05-21 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-05-20 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-20 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-20 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-15 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-05-15 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-05-13 | Referred to Public Health | |
2009-05-13 | Read first time | |
2009-05-08 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-05-08 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-08 | Record vote | |
2009-05-08 | Passed | |
2009-05-08 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-08 | Record vote | |
2009-05-08 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-08 | Record vote | |
2009-05-08 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2009-05-08 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-08 | Amended | |
2009-05-08 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-08 | Record vote | |
2009-05-08 | Amended | |
2009-05-08 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-08 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-08 | Amended | |
2009-05-08 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-08 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-08 | Record vote | |
2009-05-08 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-05-07 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-05 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-05 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-30 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-04-30 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-30 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-11 | Referred to Health & Human Services | |
2009-02-11 | Read first time | |
2008-11-10 | Filed | |
2008-11-10 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1523 (Similar To) 2009-05-11 - Placed on General State Calendar