TX SB2037 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a study regarding the feasibility of implementing a central filing system for the filing of financing statements for security interests in farm products.
Title
Relating to a study regarding the feasibility of implementing a central filing system for the filing of financing statements for security interests in farm products.
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Hall [R] | Rep. Ken King [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-05-16 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-16 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-16 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-16 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-05-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-02 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-02 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-05-02 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-02 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-16 | House | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services |
2019-04-16 | House | Read first time |
2019-04-11 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Passed |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
AGRICULTURAL LIENS
Agriculture
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
Electronic Information Systems
SECRETARY OF STATE
Agriculture
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
Electronic Information Systems
SECRETARY OF STATE