TX SB203 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a sales and use tax exemption for firearm safety equipment.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a sales and use tax exemption for firearm safety equipment.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-04-24SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-24SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-24SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-01SenateReferred to Finance
2019-02-01SenateRead first time
2018-11-16SenateFiled
2018-11-16SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB2115 (Same As) 2019-03-06 - Referred to Ways & Means

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback