TX SB2023 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-20 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to providing high-quality tutoring services to public school students, including the creation of the Texas Tutor Corps program, and the use of the compensatory education allotment for certain tutoring services programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to providing high-quality tutoring services to public school students, including the creation of the Texas Tutor Corps program, and the use of the compensatory education allotment for certain tutoring services programs.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-20SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2021-05-19SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-10SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2021-05-10SenateCo-author authorized
2021-05-04SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-04SenateCo-author authorized
2021-05-03SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-03SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-03SenateCo-author authorized
2021-04-28SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-27SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-04-27SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-04-27SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-27SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-04-26SenatePosting rule suspended
2021-04-01SenateReferred to Education
2021-04-01SenateRead first time
2021-03-12SenateFiled
2021-03-12SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB4117 (Same As) 2021-03-29 - Referred to Public Education

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback