TX SB2022 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the creation and operations of a health care provider participation program by the Harris County Hospital District.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the creation and operations of a health care provider participation program by the Harris County Hospital District.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2019-04-23SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-11SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-11SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-11SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-08SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-08SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-21SenateReferred to Intergovernmental Relations
2019-03-21SenateRead first time
2019-03-07SenateFiled
2019-03-07SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB3459 (Similar To) 2019-05-14 - Sent to the Governor

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback