TX SB202 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on June 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-17 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on June 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-17 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the transfer of certain occupational regulatory programs and the deregulation of certain activities and occupations.
Title
Relating to the transfer of certain occupational regulatory programs and the deregulation of certain activities and occupations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-30 - House - SB 202Third Reading House (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-25 - House - SB 202Third Reading House (Y: 143 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-24 - House - 2nd Reading Amendment 2 by Zerwas (Y: 51 N: 85 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2015-05-24 - House - 2nd Reading Amendment 1 by Romero, Jr. (Y: 22 N: 113 NV: 3 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2015-05-25 - House - SB 202Third Reading House (Y: 143 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-05-24 - House - 2nd Reading Amendment 2 by Zerwas (Y: 51 N: 85 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2015-05-24 - House - 2nd Reading Amendment 1 by Romero, Jr. (Y: 22 N: 113 NV: 3 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-17 | See remarks for effective date | |
2015-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-06-01 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-31 | House | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-30 | Senate | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-30 | Senate | Senate adopts conference committee report |
2015-05-30 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-30 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-30 | House | House adopts conference committee report |
2015-05-28 | House | Conf. Comm. Report distributed |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Conference committee report filed |
2015-05-28 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2015-05-28 | Senate | House grants request for conf comm-reported |
2015-05-27 | House | House appoints conferees |
2015-05-27 | House | House grants request for conference committee |
2015-05-26 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2015-05-26 | House | Senate requests conference committee-reported |
2015-05-26 | House | Senate refuses to concur-reported |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Senate requests conference committee |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Read |
2015-05-26 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2015-05-25 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2015-05-25 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-25 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-25 | House | Passed as amended |
2015-05-25 | House | Amended |
2015-05-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-24 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2015-05-24 | House | Amended |
2015-05-24 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-24 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-24 | House | Motion to table fails |
2015-05-24 | House | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-05-24 | House | Amended |
2015-05-24 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-24 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-24 | House | Motion to table fails |
2015-05-24 | House | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-05-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-24 | House | Placed on Major State Calendar |
2015-05-21 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-05-19 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-19 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-05-15 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-05-15 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-05-15 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2015-05-14 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2015-05-14 | House | Read first time |
2015-05-14 | House | Received from the Senate |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Filed |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
DIETITIANS ADVISORY BOARD
Governor
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--General
HEARING INSTRUMENT FITTERS AND DISPENSERS ADVISORY BOARD
Human Services
Human Services--General
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
MEDICAL BOARD, TEXAS
MEDICAL PHYSICIST LICENSURE ADVISORY COMMITTEE
MEDICAL RADIOLOGIC TECHNOLOGY, TEXAS BOARD OF
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
MIDWIVES ADVISORY BOARD
NURSING, TEXAS BOARD OF
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
ORTHOTISTS AND PROSTHETISTS ADVISORY BOARD
PERFUSIONIST LICENSURE ADVISORY COMMITTEE
PHYSICIAN ASSISTANT BOARD, TEXAS
RESPIRATORY CARE, TEXAS BOARD OF
SPEECH-LANGUAGE PATHOLOGISTS AND AUDIOLOGISTS ADVISORY BOARD
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Sunset
Sunset--Commission Bills
Governor
Health
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Health--General
HEARING INSTRUMENT FITTERS AND DISPENSERS ADVISORY BOARD
Human Services
Human Services--General
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
MEDICAL BOARD, TEXAS
MEDICAL PHYSICIST LICENSURE ADVISORY COMMITTEE
MEDICAL RADIOLOGIC TECHNOLOGY, TEXAS BOARD OF
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
MIDWIVES ADVISORY BOARD
NURSING, TEXAS BOARD OF
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
ORTHOTISTS AND PROSTHETISTS ADVISORY BOARD
PERFUSIONIST LICENSURE ADVISORY COMMITTEE
PHYSICIAN ASSISTANT BOARD, TEXAS
RESPIRATORY CARE, TEXAS BOARD OF
SPEECH-LANGUAGE PATHOLOGISTS AND AUDIOLOGISTS ADVISORY BOARD
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Sunset
Sunset--Commission Bills