TX SB2015 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-17 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-17 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the legislature's goals for electric generation capacity in this state.
Title
Relating to the legislature's goals for electric generation capacity in this state.
Sponsors
Sen. Phil King [R] | Sen. Charles Schwertner [R] | Sen. Paul Bettencourt [R] | Sen. Bryan Hughes [R] |
Sen. Lois Kolkhorst [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-05 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 20 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-17 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2023-04-17 | House | Read first time |
2023-04-06 | House | Received from the Senate |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Remarks ordered printed |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Passed |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Remarks ordered printed |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Filed |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Energy
Energy--General
PUBLIC UTILITY COMMISSION
Utilities
Utilities--Electric
Utilities--General
Utilities--Natural Gas
Energy--General
PUBLIC UTILITY COMMISSION
Utilities
Utilities--Electric
Utilities--General
Utilities--Natural Gas