TX SB201 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 17 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to increasing the criminal penalties for certain offenses committed in a disaster area or an evacuated area.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to increasing the criminal penalties for certain offenses committed in a disaster area or an evacuated area.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-17 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1469 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-21HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-20SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-17SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-17SenateHouse passage reported
2019-05-17HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-17HouseRecord vote RV#1469
2019-05-17HousePassed
2019-05-17HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-16HousePassed to 3rd reading
2019-05-16HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-16HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-14HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-03HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-02HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-02HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-29HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-29HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-25HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-25HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-25HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-25HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-04HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2019-04-04HouseRead first time
2019-04-03HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-02SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-02SenateRecord vote
2019-04-02SenatePassed
2019-04-02SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-02SenateRecord vote
2019-04-02SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-02SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-02SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-04-02SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-04-01SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-01SenateCo-author authorized
2019-03-18SenateCorrected comm. report printed & distributed
2019-03-06SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-03-06SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-03-06SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-03-04SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-02-28SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-02-28SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-02-28SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-02-28SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-12SenateCo-author authorized
2019-02-01SenateReferred to State Affairs
2019-02-01SenateRead first time
2018-11-16SenateFiled
2018-11-16SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB3895 (Same As) 2019-03-19 - Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
HB1028 (Similar To) 2019-05-23 - House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback