TX SB1999 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-14 - Co-author authorized
Status: Introduced on March 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-14 - Co-author authorized
Summary
Relating to the eligibility of certain nonprofit wildlife conservation associations to conduct charitable raffles.
Title
Relating to the eligibility of certain nonprofit wildlife conservation associations to conduct charitable raffles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-14 | Co-author authorized | |
2009-03-24 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2009-03-24 | Read first time | |
2009-03-12 | Filed | |
2009-03-12 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3113 (Same As) 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Subjects
Amusements, Games, Sports
Charitable & Nonprofit Organizations
Parks & Wildlife
Parks & Wildlife--General
RAFFLES
Charitable & Nonprofit Organizations
Parks & Wildlife
Parks & Wildlife--General
RAFFLES