TX SB1998 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-29 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Water & Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-29 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Water & Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the deposit and allocation of certain funds to the horse industry escrow account.
Title
Relating to the deposit and allocation of certain funds to the horse industry escrow account.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Water & Rural Affairs |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Filed |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2463 (Same As) 2019-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/19
Subjects
Amusements, Games, Sports
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
ESCROW
HORSE RACING
HORSES
PARI-MUTUEL WAGERING
RACING COMMISSION, TEXAS
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
ESCROW
HORSE RACING
HORSES
PARI-MUTUEL WAGERING
RACING COMMISSION, TEXAS
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB1998 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB01998I.htm |