TX SB1994 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-23 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-23 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to residential mortgage loans, including the financing of residential real estate purchases by means of a wrap mortgage loan; providing licensing requirements; authorizing an administrative penalty.
Title
Relating to residential mortgage loans, including the financing of residential real estate purchases by means of a wrap mortgage loan; providing licensing requirements; authorizing an administrative penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-15 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-21 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-20 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-20 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-18 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-18 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-18 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-18 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-05-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-18 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-17 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2017-05-16 | House | Referred to Investments & Financial Services |
2017-05-16 | House | Read first time |
2017-05-16 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Filed |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
FINANCE COMMISSION OF TEXAS
Financial
Financial--General
LOANS
Property Interests
Property Interests--Mortgages & Liens
SAVINGS & MORTGAGE LENDING, DEPARTMENT OF
Business & Commerce--General
FINANCE COMMISSION OF TEXAS
Financial
Financial--General
LOANS
Property Interests
Property Interests--Mortgages & Liens
SAVINGS & MORTGAGE LENDING, DEPARTMENT OF