TX SB1984 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-24 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-24 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the canvass of election returns for the offices of governor and lieutenant governor.
Title
Relating to the canvass of election returns for the offices of governor and lieutenant governor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-24 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-23 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-23 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-05-22 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-05-22 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-05-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-05-20 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-05-20 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2015-05-14 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2015-05-14 | House | Read first time |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-04-28 | House | Received from the Senate |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Passed |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Filed |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
SJR66 (Enabling for) 2015-05-24 - Committee report sent to Calendars