TX SB1978 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 78-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the protection of membership in, affiliation with, and support provided to religious organizations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the protection of membership in, affiliation with, and support provided to religious organizations.

Sponsors

Sen. Bryan Hughes [R]Sen. Paul Bettencourt [R]Sen. Donna Campbell [R]Sen. Charles Creighton [R]
Sen. Pat Fallon [R]Sen. Bob Hall [R]Sen. Lois Kolkhorst [R]Sen. Jane Nelson [R]
Sen. Charles Perry [R]Rep. Matt Krause [R]Rep. Scott Sanford [R]Rep. Dade Phelan [R]
Rep. Tom Oliverson [R]Rep. Stephen Allison [R]Rep. Charles Anderson [R]Rep. Trent Ashby [R]
Rep. Cecil Bell [R]Rep. Keith Bell [R]Rep. Kyle Biedermann [R]Rep. Dwayne Bohac [R]
Rep. Greg Bonnen [R]Rep. Brad Buckley [R]Rep. Dewayne Burns [R]Rep. Dustin Burrows [R]
Rep. Briscoe Cain [R]Rep. Giovanni Capriglione [R]Rep. Travis Clardy [R]Rep. Tom Craddick [R]
Rep. John Cyrier [R]Rep. Drew Darby [R]Rep. Jay Dean [R]Rep. Dan Flynn [R]
Rep. James Frank [R]Rep. John Frullo [R]Rep. Ryan Guillen [D]Rep. Cody Harris [R]
Rep. Cole Hefner [R]Rep. Justin Holland [R]Rep. Dan Huberty [R]Rep. Kyle Kacal [R]
Rep. Phil King [R]Rep. Stephanie Klick [R]Rep. John Kuempel [R]Rep. Stan Lambert [R]
Rep. Brooks Landgraf [R]Rep. Mike Lang [R]Rep. Jeff Leach [R]Rep. Ben Leman [R]
Rep. J.M. Lozano [R]Rep. William Metcalf [R]Rep. Mayes Middleton [R]Rep. Rick Miller [R]
Rep. Geanie Morrison [R]Rep. Jim Murphy [R]Rep. Andrew Murr [R]Rep. Candy Noble [R]
Rep. Chris Paddie [R]Rep. Tan Parker [R]Rep. Jared Patterson [R]Rep. Dennis Paul [R]
Rep. John Raney [R]Rep. Matt Schaefer [R]Rep. Matthew Shaheen [R]Rep. Hugh Shine [R]
Rep. Reggie Smith [R]Rep. John Smithee [R]Rep. Drew Springer [R]Rep. Phil Stephenson [R]
Rep. Jonathan Stickland [R]Rep. Lynn Stucky [R]Rep. Valoree Swanson [R]Rep. Ed Thompson [R]
Rep. Tony Tinderholt [R]Rep. Steve Toth [R]Rep. Gary Vandeaver [R]Rep. James White [R]
Rep. Terry Wilson [R]Rep. John Wray [R]Rep. William Zedler [R]

Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1530 (Y: 79 N: 64 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal RV#1513 (Y: 79 N: 62 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1512 (Y: 65 N: 76 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 19 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Amendment adopted as amended (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Amendment amended (Y: 12 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 12 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-10 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-06-10 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-25 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-25HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-25SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-23SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-23HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2019-05-23SenateRecord vote
2019-05-23SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2019-05-23SenateRead
2019-05-23SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2019-05-21SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2019-05-21HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-21HouseRecord vote RV#1530
2019-05-21HousePassed
2019-05-21HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-20HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-20HouseRecord vote RV#1513
2019-05-20HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2019-05-20HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-20HouseRecord vote RV#1512
2019-05-20HouseAmendment fails of adoption 2-J. González, et al.
2019-05-20HousePoint of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2
2019-05-20HouseAmendment(s) offered 2-J. González, M. González, J.E. Johnson, Israel, and Zwiener
2019-05-20HouseAmended 1-Krause
2019-05-20HousePoint of order overruled Rule 4, Section 16, and Rule 4, Section 18(a); Article III, Section 37
2019-05-20HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-20HousePlaced on Major State Calendar
2019-05-17HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-17HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-17HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-17HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-17HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-05-17HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-05-16HouseReferred to State Affairs
2019-05-16HouseRead first time
2019-05-16HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-05-16SenateReported engrossed
2019-05-16SenateRemarks ordered printed
2019-05-16SenateReason for vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-16SenateRecord vote
2019-05-16SenatePassed
2019-05-16SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-16SenateRecord vote
2019-05-16SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-16SenateCo-author authorized
2019-05-15SenateRecord vote
2019-05-15SenatePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-05-15SenateRecord vote
2019-05-15SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2019-05-15SenateAmendment(s) offered FA5 Rodríguez
2019-05-15SenateRecord vote
2019-05-15SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2019-05-15SenateAmendment(s) offered FA4 Menéndez
2019-05-15SenateAmendment withdrawn
2019-05-15SenateAmendment(s) offered FA3 Rodríguez
2019-05-15SenateRecord vote
2019-05-15SenateAmendment adopted as amended FA1 Hughes
2019-05-15SenateRecord vote
2019-05-15SenateAmendment amended FA2 Hughes
2019-05-15SenateRecord vote
2019-05-15SenateAmendment fails of adoption
2019-05-15SenateSubstitute amendment offered FA2 Menéndez
2019-05-15SenateAmendment to amendment offered FA2 Hughes
2019-05-15SenatePoint of order overruled
2019-05-15SenatePoint of order
2019-05-15SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Hughes
2019-05-15SenateRead 2nd time
2019-05-15SenateRecord vote
2019-05-15SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-15SenateCo-author authorized
2019-05-14SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-13SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-13SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-13SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-13SenatePosting rule suspended
2019-05-07SenateCo-author authorized
2019-03-19SenateReferred to State Affairs
2019-03-19SenateRead first time
2019-03-07SenateFiled
2019-03-07SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB3172 (Same As) 2019-05-09 - Returned to committee

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB1978
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB01978I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB01978S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB01978E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB01978H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SB01978F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-15-F.PDF#page=33
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-15-F.PDF#page=35
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-15-F.PDF#page=36
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-15-F.PDF#page=37
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-16-F.PDF#page=12
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-16-F.PDF#page=13
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB1978&RcdVtNo=1512&Ch=H&Dt=05/20/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB1978&RcdVtNo=1513&Ch=H&Dt=05/20/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SB1978&RcdVtNo=1530&Ch=H&Dt=05/21/2019
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-23-F.PDF#page=481

Bill Comments

feedback