TX SB1975 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-23 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-23 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to establishing the Texas Peace Officers' Memorial Ceremony Committee to recognize and honor peace officers who were killed in the line of duty.
Title
Relating to establishing the Texas Peace Officers' Memorial Ceremony Committee to recognize and honor peace officers who were killed in the line of duty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-21 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-18 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-18 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-16 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-09 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2017-05-09 | House | Read first time |
2017-05-04 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Corrected comm. report printed & distributed |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Filed |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
PEACE OFFICERS
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
Fire Fighters & Police--General
PEACE OFFICERS
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions