TX SB1954 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-22 - 1 hr. notice-to suspend rules
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-22 - 1 hr. notice-to suspend rules
Summary
Relating to a temporary faculty license for chiropractic faculty.
Title
Relating to a temporary faculty license for chiropractic faculty.
Sponsors
Rep. Rafael Anchia [D] | Sen. Charles Creighton [R] | Rep. Kirk England [D] | Sen. James Jackson [R] |
Rep. Ken Legler [R] | Rep. Wayne Smith [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-22 | 1 hr. notice-to suspend rules | |
2009-05-20 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-05-18 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-05-11 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-11 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-11 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-06 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-05-06 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-05-01 | Referred to Public Health | |
2009-05-01 | Read first time | |
2009-04-27 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-04-24 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-24 | Record vote | |
2009-04-24 | Passed | |
2009-04-24 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-24 | Record vote | |
2009-04-24 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-24 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-24 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-24 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-04-23 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-22 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-21 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-17 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-17 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-17 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-14 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-04-14 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-14 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-24 | Referred to Health & Human Services | |
2009-03-24 | Read first time | |
2009-03-12 | Filed | |
2009-03-12 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3450 (Same As) 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Subjects
CHIROPRACTIC & CHIROPRACTORS
CHIROPRACTIC EXAMINERS, TEXAS BOARD OF
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Faculty
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
CHIROPRACTIC EXAMINERS, TEXAS BOARD OF
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Faculty
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations