TX SB195 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to grounds for refusal of certain alcoholic beverage licenses and permits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to grounds for refusal of certain alcoholic beverage licenses and permits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-08 - House - Read 3rd time RV#898 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-24 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-05-24 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-12 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-12HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-12SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-10SenateReported enrolled
2021-05-10SenateHouse passage reported
2021-05-08HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-08HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-08HouseRecord vote RV#898
2021-05-08HousePassed
2021-05-08HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-08HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-08HousePassed to 3rd reading
2021-05-08HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-08HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2021-05-04HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2021-04-30HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-04-30HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-29HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-26HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-26HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-04-26HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-26HouseScheduled for formal meeting on . . .
2021-04-14HouseReferred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
2021-04-14HouseRead first time
2021-04-12HouseReceived from the Senate
2021-04-09SenateReported engrossed
2021-04-09SenateRecord vote
2021-04-09SenatePassed
2021-04-09SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-09SenateRecord vote
2021-04-09SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-09SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-09SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2021-04-09SenateLaid before the Senate
2021-04-09SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2021-03-31SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-03-31SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-03-31SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-03-30SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-30SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-03SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2021-03-03SenateRead first time
2020-11-16SenateFiled
2020-11-16SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB436 (Same As) 2021-02-25 - Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB195
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00195I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00195S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00195E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00195H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB00195F.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00195I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/SB00195I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00195H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/SB00195F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-09-F.PDF#page=1
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB195&RcdVtNo=898&Ch=H&Dt=05/08/2021

Bill Comments

feedback