TX SB1945 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 1/1/10
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 1/1/10
Summary
Relating to the issuance of a citation to an owner of real property for a violation of a county or municipal rule or ordinance.
Title
Relating to the issuance of a citation to an owner of real property for a violation of a county or municipal rule or ordinance.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Deshotel [D] | Sen. Royce West [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective on 1/1/10 | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-06-01 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-31 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-29 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-29 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported | |
2009-05-29 | Record vote | |
2009-05-29 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) | |
2009-05-29 | Read | |
2009-05-29 | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate | |
2009-05-26 | House passage as amended reported | |
2009-05-26 | Record vote | |
2009-05-26 | Passed | |
2009-05-26 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-24 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2009-05-24 | Amended | |
2009-05-24 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-22 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-19 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-05-15 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-05-14 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-14 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-12 | Reported favorably as amended | |
2009-05-12 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-05-12 | Amendment(s) considered in committee | |
2009-05-12 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-05-01 | Referred to Business & Industry | |
2009-05-01 | Read first time | |
2009-04-24 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-04-23 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-23 | Record vote | |
2009-04-23 | Passed | |
2009-04-23 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-23 | Record vote | |
2009-04-23 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-23 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-23 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-23 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-04-22 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-04-21 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-20 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-20 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-17 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-15 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-15 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-04-15 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-15 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-24 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | |
2009-03-24 | Read first time | |
2009-03-12 | Filed | |
2009-03-12 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--General
County Government
County Government--General
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
City Government--General
County Government
County Government--General
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property