TX SB1931 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-17 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Land & Resource Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-17 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Land & Resource Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to community land trusts.
Title
Relating to community land trusts.
Sponsors
Sen. Royce West [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-17 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-05-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-16 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2017-05-12 | House | Referred to Land & Resource Management |
2017-05-12 | House | Read first time |
2017-05-11 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Filed |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Charitable & Nonprofit Organizations
Housing
Housing--General
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
Property Interests--Trusts
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Housing
Housing--General
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
Property Interests--Trusts
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions