TX SB1927 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-11 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the appointment, duties, and removal of the state prosecuting attorney.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the appointment, duties, and removal of the state prosecuting attorney.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-11SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2023-04-05SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2023-04-03SenateCo-author authorized
2023-03-30SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2023-03-30SenateReported favorably as substituted
2023-03-27SenateVote taken in committee
2023-03-27SenateConsidered in public hearing
2023-03-23SenateLeft pending in committee
2023-03-23SenateTestimony taken in committee
2023-03-23SenateConsidered in public hearing
2023-03-23SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2023-03-20SenateReferred to State Affairs
2023-03-20SenateRead first time
2023-03-08SenateFiled
2023-03-08SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback