TX SB1927 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority of certain volunteer firefighter and emergency services organizations to hold tax-free sales or auctions.
Title
Relating to the authority of certain volunteer firefighter and emergency services organizations to hold tax-free sales or auctions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective immediately | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-24 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-24 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-23 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-23 | House passage reported | |
2011-05-23 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-23 | Record vote | |
2011-05-23 | Constitutional three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-23 | Record vote | |
2011-05-23 | Passed | |
2011-05-23 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-23 | Passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-23 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-23 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-05-21 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-05-21 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-05-20 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-20 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-20 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-05-20 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-05-20 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-05-20 | Referred to Ways & Means | |
2011-05-20 | Read first time | |
2011-05-19 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-05-19 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-05-19 | Record vote | |
2011-05-19 | Passed | |
2011-05-19 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-19 | Record vote | |
2011-05-19 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-19 | Record vote | |
2011-05-19 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2011-05-19 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-19 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-05-19 | Co-author authorized | |
2011-05-18 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-05-17 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-17 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-05-16 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-12 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-05-12 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-05-12 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-12 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-03 | Referred to Finance | |
2011-05-03 | Read first time | |
2011-05-03 | Permission to introduce | |
2011-05-03 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
AUCTIONS & AUCTIONEERS
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
Fire Fighters & Police--Volunteer
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Safety
Taxation
Taxation--Sales
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
Fire Fighters & Police--Volunteer
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Safety
Taxation
Taxation--Sales